Vedic Maths Shortcut for Fast Calculations

Maths

Square any two digit number: 

Suppose the number is 47

Look for the nearest multiple of 10

Example:
The nearest number is 50. We will reach 50 if we add 3 to 47

So multiply (47+3) x (47-3) = 50 × 44 = 2200 This is the 1st interim answer.

We had added 3 to reach the nearest multiple of 10 that is 50 thus 3x 3 = 9 This is the second interim answer.

The final answer is 2200 + 9 = 2209

Multiply any two numbers from 11 to 20 in Easy Way: 

Example:

Take 15 × 13

Take the larger no on the top and the second digit of the smaller no. in the bottom.
15
3

Add 15+3 = 18 . Then multiply 18 × 10 = 180

Now multiply the second digit of both the no.s (ie; 5 × 3 = 15) Now add 180 + 15.

Here is the answer 180 + 15 = 195

This is a simple trick. It will help you a lot.

Multiply any two digit number with 11: 

Example:
27 × 11

Divide the number as 2 _ 7

Add 2 + 7 = 9

Thus the answer is 2 9 7

But there is one complication. If you take a number like 57 Thus 5_7 x 11

Divide the number as 5 _ 7

Add 5 + 7 = 12

Now add 1 to 5 and place 2 in the middle so the answer is 5+1_2 _7 = _627

Thus the answer is 627.


Square a two digit number ending in Five:

Let the number be 35

35 × 35

Multiply the last digits of both the numbers 5 × 5 = 25

now add 1 to 3 thus 3 + 1 = 4

multiply 4 × 3 = 12

thus answer 1225

You will have to think over this one carefully.As 5 has to come in the end so the last two digits o the answer will be 25 . Add 1 to the first digit and multiply it by the original first digit . Now this answer forms the digits before the 25. Thus we get an answer.


Top 5 Career Tips for Job Seekers



Best Tips to Crack Technical Interviews


Help & Get Help: Please share this page by clicking the below three buttons "Share on Facebook", "Share on Twitter" and "Share on Google Plus"


share facebook
Share on Google Plus
    Blogger Comment
    Facebook Comment

0 comments:

Post a Comment

Placement Papers & Interview Questions